Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2048 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2048
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain procedures for cases and orders relating to the
 Title IV-D agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 201.104(e), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d) and subject to Section
 201.1042(g), an associate judge may hear and render an order on any
 matter necessary to be decided in connection with a Title IV-D
 service, including:
 (1)  a suit to modify or clarify an existing child
 support order;
 (2)  a motion to enforce a child support order or revoke
 a respondent's community supervision and suspension of commitment;
 (3)  a respondent's compliance with the conditions
 provided in the associate judge's report for suspension of the
 respondent's commitment; [or]
 (4)  a motion for postjudgment relief, including a
 motion for a new trial or to vacate, correct, or reform a judgment,
 if neither party has requested a de novo hearing before the
 referring court;
 (5)  a suit affecting the parent-child relationship;
 and
 (6)  a suit for modification under Chapter 156.
 SECTION 2.  Section 231.118, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a return of the process
 made under this section in a suit may not include the address served
 if:
 (1)  a pleading filed in the suit requests a finding
 under Section 105.006(c); or
 (2)  the court has previously made a finding and
 ordered nondisclosure under Section 105.006(c) relating to the
 parties and the order has not been superseded.
 SECTION 3.  Section 233.024(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  On the filing of an agreed child support review order
 signed by all parties, together with waiver of service, the court
 shall sign the order not later than the third day after the filing
 of the order.  On expiration of the third day after the filing of the
 order, the order is considered confirmed by the court by operation
 of law, regardless of whether the court has signed the order.  The
 court may sign the order before filing the order, but the signed
 order shall immediately be filed.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 201.104, Family Code, applies only to a Title IV-D case referred to
 an associate judge under Subchapter B, Chapter 201, Family Code, on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A Title IV-D case referred
 to an associate judge before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the case was referred, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act to Section 231.118,
 Family Code, applies to a suit affecting the parent-child
 relationship filed on or after the effective date of this Act.  A
 suit affecting the parent-child relationship filed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the suit was filed, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *