Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2065 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2017

                    By: Phillips, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2065
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fines collected by a county or municipality from the
 enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety standards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 644.102, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (f-1) and (f-2) to read as follows:
 (f-1)  A municipality or county that retains a fine from the
 enforcement of this chapter shall annually file with the
 comptroller a report that details the amount of fines retained from
 the enforcement of this chapter and the actual expenses claimed by
 the municipality or county for the enforcement of this chapter
 during the previous fiscal year. A municipality or county that
 fails to file a report as required by this subsection shall send to
 the comptroller for deposit to the credit of the Texas Department of
 Transportation an amount equal to the amount retained by the
 municipality or county in the fiscal year the report would cover.
 (f-2)  The comptroller shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement and enforce Subsection (f-1).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *