Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2067 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Oliveira (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2067
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the registration of a related finance company for
 purposes of the motor vehicle sales and use tax; repealing the
 authorization for a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.0475(c), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  A related finance company may [annually] register with
 the comptroller on a form prescribed by the comptroller. The
 comptroller shall make the forms available to the public. A
 registration remains in effect until canceled by the registration
 holder or the comptroller.
 SECTION 2.  Section 152.0475(d), Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *