Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2102 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 21, 2017      TO: Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2102 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to the continuation and functions of the state bar.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2102, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 21, 2017





  TO: Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2102 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to the continuation and functions of the state bar.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2102 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to the continuation and functions of the state bar.), As Introduced

 Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2102 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to the continuation and functions of the state bar.), As Introduced

HB2102 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to the continuation and functions of the state bar.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2102, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2102, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 $0   2021 $0   2022 $0    


2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 $0
2021 $0
2022 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromAppropriated Receipts666    2018 $850,000   2019 $850,000   2020 $0   2021 $0   2022 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromAppropriated Receipts666    2018 $850,000   2019 $850,000   2020 $0   2021 $0   2022 $0  


2018 $850,000
2019 $850,000
2020 $0
2021 $0
2022 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government Code to extend the agency's sunset expiration date to September 1, 2029 and would require all members of the bar that have not previously done so to submit fingerprints to facilitate a Texas and Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) criminal background check, and would allow the bar to suspend or refuse to renew the license of any member that fails to do so. The bill would take effect September 1, 2017.

Methodology

According to the State Bar and the Board of Law Examiners, there are 100,000 active state bar members. According to the Department of Public Safety (DPS), the provisions of the bill would require additional checks of all active State Bar members. DPS charges a $27.00 fee for each application for a fingerprint-based criminal background check. Of this fee amount, the agency retains $17.00 per application with these amounts counted towards the agency's appropriated receipts and the remainder remitted to the FBI.  This estimate assumes 100,000 active state bar members would be required to submit to a fingerprint-based criminal background check, or 50,000 each year of the 2018-19 biennium. Of the total revenue from this fee, DPS would retain $850,000 in appropriated receipts each year of the 2018-19 biennium (50,000 applicants X $17 retained by DPS per application). According to the Sunset Commission, the Department of Public Safety, the Office of Court Administration, and the Comptroller of Public Accounts, the remaining provisions of the bill could be accomplished through existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 405 Department of Public Safety

116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 405 Department of Public Safety

LBB Staff: UP, LBO, MW, GDz, SD, FR

 UP, LBO, MW, GDz, SD, FR