By: Roberts, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2130 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study conducted by the Texas Education Agency regarding the statewide assessment program in relation to students in special education programs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 39.02302 to read as follows: Sec. 39.02302. STUDY OF STATEWIDE ASSESSMENT PROGRAM IN RELATION TO STUDENTS IN SPECIAL EDUCATION PROGRAMS. (a) Using data collected by the agency, including data collected during the 2015-2016 and 2017-2018 school years, the agency, from funds already appropriated, shall conduct a study of the impact of the statewide assessment program on students in a special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29. (b) In conducting the study, the agency shall address: (1) whether the agency has determined that the administration of alternate assessment instruments to students in a special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, as provided by Section 39.023(b) complies with the Every Student Succeeds Act (20 U.S.C. Section 6301 et seq.); (2) whether administering state-required assessment instruments, other than assessment instruments developed or adopted under Section 39.023(b), to students in a special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, will: (A) provide an accurate assessment of the academic achievement of the students; (B) result in the administration of assessment instruments that are inappropriate for the educational capacity of the students; (C) result in a decrease in the number of students promoted to the next grade level; (D) result in a decrease in graduation rates for the students; (E) result in fewer opportunities to pursue higher education options; (F) result in fewer opportunities for competitive integrated employment for the students; and (G) result in any other: (i) restrictions on the students; (ii) alternative placements for the students; or (iii) limitations on the advancement of the students; and (3) whether making a statutory change that has the effect of exempting students in a special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, from the administration of an assessment instrument under Section 39.023 unless the student's parent or guardian requests such administration would impact the statewide assessment program and the extent of any such impact, including any legal impact. (c) In conducting the study, the agency shall identify specific recommendations to improve the impact of the statewide assessment program on students in a special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, including recommendations for: (1) any reforms or changes with respect to contracting with assessment instrument vendors; (2) any reforms or changes with respect to improving student grade-level promotion rates and student graduation rates; (3) any reforms or changes with respect to developing allowable accommodations and applying principles of universal design for students during the administration of assessment instruments; (4) any changes to rules adopted by the State Board of Education or the commissioner relating to the development, adoption, or administration of assessment instruments; (5) any statutory changes to this code relating to the development, adoption, or administration of assessment instruments; and (6) any additional reforms or changes based on the results of the study. (d) Not later than October 1, 2018, the agency shall submit a report to each member of the legislature containing the agency's determinations and recommendations under this section. (e) The agency shall publish on the agency's Internet website the report submitted under Subsection (d), all data on which the agency relied to form the basis of the agency's determinations and recommendations, and the methodologies the agency used to conduct the study. (f) This section expires January 1, 2019. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *