Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2182 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Reynolds, Zerwas, Miller H.B. No. 2182
 (Senate Sponsor - Miles)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a county assistance district to impose
 a sales and use tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 387.003, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  In determining the combined tax rate under Subsections
 (b), (f), and (h), the following are considered to not be included
 in the territory of the proposed district or the area proposed to be
 added to the district:
 (1)  rights-of-way; and
 (2)  any area in which a county facility is located and
 in which no person has a place of business to which a sales tax
 permit has been issued under Subchapter F, Chapter 151, Tax Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 387.007, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  In determining the combined tax rate under Subsection
 (b), the following are considered to not be included in the
 territory of the district:
 (1)  rights-of-way; and
 (2)  any area in which a county facility is located and
 in which no person has a place of business to which a sales tax
 permit has been issued under Subchapter F, Chapter 151, Tax Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *