By: King of Parker, Springer, Lang H.B. No. 2194 (Senate Sponsor - Estes) (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017; May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 1; May 4, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior College District. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 130, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 130.0828 to read as follows: Sec. 130.0828. ADDITIONAL TRUSTEES FOR WEATHERFORD JUNIOR COLLEGE DISTRICT. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to the members of the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior College District elected or appointed under other provisions of this subchapter, the commissioners court of each county in which a branch campus of the district is located and that imposed a branch campus maintenance tax under Section 130.253 on September 1, 2017, shall appoint one member to serve on the district's board of trustees. (b) Members of the board of trustees appointed under this section serve two-year terms and may be appointed to serve successive terms. The commissioners court shall appoint initial members to serve a term beginning December 1, 2017. (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d), a member of the board of trustees appointed under this section may participate in the decision-making of the board to the same extent as any other member of the board, including by voting on any budget that affects the entire district. (d) A member of the board of trustees appointed under this section: (1) may not participate in the decision-making of the board in matters related to: (A) the imposition of a tax; or (B) an issue that only affects a campus located in the junior college district; (2) is not counted for purposes of determining whether a quorum of the board is present for the purpose of Subdivision (1); and (3) may not serve as an officer of the board of trustees. (e) Unless this section is continued in effect by the legislature, this section expires on December 1, 2027. SECTION 2. The commissioners court of each county to which Section 130.0828, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies shall appoint the initial members of the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior College District under that section not later than November 30, 2017. SECTION 3. SEVERABILITY. (a) It is the intent of the legislature that every provision, section, subsection, sentence, clause, phrase, and word in this Act, and every application of the provisions in this Act to each local law, are severable from each other. All constitutionally valid and lawful applications of this Act shall be severed from an application that a court finds to be invalid, leaving the valid applications in force because it is the legislature's intent and priority that the valid applications be allowed to stand alone. (b) A court may not decline to enforce the severability requirements in this Act on the ground that the enforcement of the severability requirements would be contrary to legislative intent. The legislature hereby declares that it intends for the severability requirements of this Act to be enforced as written, without any exceptions. (c) A court may not decline to enforce the severability requirements of this Act on the ground that the Act's provisions or applications are essentially and inseparably connected. The legislature hereby declares that it intends for the severability requirements of this Act to be enforced without regard to whether this Act's provisions or applications are essentially and inseparably connected. (d) If a final court order or judgment finds that the composition of the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior College District as composed under this Act is invalid, the court-ordered remedy shall require the appointment of members of the board of trustees by the commissioners court of each county in which a branch campus of the district is located in the manner described by Section 130.0828, Education Code, as added by this Act, so that the composition of the board of trustees complies with applicable law. (e) Section 311.032(a), Government Code, applies to this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *