Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2215 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 14, 2017      TO: Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2215 by Price (Relating to the deadline for adoption of desired future conditions in groundwater conservation districts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Water Code requiring districts to consider groundwater availability models. The bill would require a district not later than January 5, 2022 to finally adopt the desired future conditions for the management area and propose and adopt subsequent desired future conditions every five years.  Not late than May 1, 2021 and every five years thereafter the district would be required to consider groundwater availability models. The bill would repeal Section 36.108(d-5) of the Water Code.The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2017.  Local Government Impact According to the Central Texas Groundwater Conservation District the district would need an additional $20,000 in consultant fees and models to comply with the bill's provisions.     Source Agencies:   LBB Staff:  UP, SZ, GG, BM, CL    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 14, 2017





  TO: Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2215 by Price (Relating to the deadline for adoption of desired future conditions in groundwater conservation districts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2215 by Price (Relating to the deadline for adoption of desired future conditions in groundwater conservation districts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources 

 Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2215 by Price (Relating to the deadline for adoption of desired future conditions in groundwater conservation districts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2215 by Price (Relating to the deadline for adoption of desired future conditions in groundwater conservation districts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Water Code requiring districts to consider groundwater availability models. The bill would require a district not later than January 5, 2022 to finally adopt the desired future conditions for the management area and propose and adopt subsequent desired future conditions every five years.  Not late than May 1, 2021 and every five years thereafter the district would be required to consider groundwater availability models. The bill would repeal Section 36.108(d-5) of the Water Code.The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2017. 

Local Government Impact

According to the Central Texas Groundwater Conservation District the district would need an additional $20,000 in consultant fees and models to comply with the bill's provisions. 

Source Agencies:



LBB Staff: UP, SZ, GG, BM, CL

 UP, SZ, GG, BM, CL