H.B. No. 239 AN ACT relating to a report regarding the confinement of pregnant inmates by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "department" means the Texas Department of Criminal Justice. (b) The department shall prepare a report on the confinement of pregnant inmates in facilities operated by or under contract with the department. The report must include: (1) a description of the department's implementation of policies and procedures to provide adequate care to pregnant inmates while confined in a facility operated by or under contract with the department, and any policies adopted by the department regarding the placement of a pregnant inmate in administrative segregation; (2) information regarding the health care provided to a pregnant inmate, including the availability of: (A) obstetrical or gynecological care; (B) prenatal health care visits; (C) mental health care; and (D) drug abuse or chemical dependency treatment; (3) a detailed summary of the following as applicable to pregnant inmates: (A) nutritional standards, including the average caloric intake of a pregnant inmate and other dietary information; (B) work assignments; (C) housing conditions; and (D) situations in which a pregnant inmate has been restrained, including the reason a determination to use restraints was made under Section 501.066, Government Code; and (4) the number of miscarriages experienced by pregnant inmates while confined in a facility operated by or under contract with the department between September 1, 2017, and September 1, 2018. (c) Not later than December 1, 2018, the department shall provide a copy of the report to: (1) the governor; (2) the lieutenant governor; (3) the speaker of the house of representatives; and (4) each standing committee of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over matters relating to corrections. SECTION 2. This Act expires February 1, 2019. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 239 was passed by the House on April 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 17, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 239 was passed by the Senate on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor