Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB240 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 240
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 240 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to evidence in a suit to abate certain common nuisances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 125.004, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), and (e) to read
 as follows:
 (a-1)  Proof in the form of a person's arrest or the
 testimony of a law enforcement agent that an activity described by
 Section 125.0015(a)(6) or (7) is committed at a place licensed as a
 massage establishment under Chapter 455, Occupations Code, or
 advertised as offering massage therapy or massage services is prima
 facie evidence that the defendant knowingly tolerated the activity.
 (a-2)  Proof that an activity described by Section
 125.0015(a)(18) is committed at a place maintained by the defendant
 is prima facie evidence that the defendant:
 (1)  knowingly tolerated the activity; and
 (2)  did not make a reasonable attempt to abate the
 activity.
 (e)  Evidence of a previous suit filed under this chapter
 that resulted in a judgment against a landowner with respect to an
 activity described by Section 125.0015 at the landowner's property
 is admissible in a subsequent suit filed under this chapter to
 demonstrate that the landowner:
 (1)  knowingly tolerated the activity; and
 (2)  did not make a reasonable attempt to abate the
 activity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *