Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2413 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Burkett (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2413
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2413 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain identifying information regarding career
 school or college students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 132.024(a)(2), Education Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Student information" means identifying
 information [in the commission's possession] regarding a student
 that is in the possession of the commission, a career school or
 college, or any other school, educational institution, or business
 entity from which the commission receives, or regarding which the
 commission reviews, information through its administration or
 enforcement of this chapter. The term includes:
 (A)  a student's name, address, telephone number,
 social security number, e-mail address, or date of birth;
 (B)  any other identifying number or other
 information that foreseeably could be combined with other publicly
 available information to reveal identifying information regarding
 the student; and
 (C)  a student's education records, as defined by
 34 C.F.R. Section 99.3.
 SECTION 2.  Section 132.024(c), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Unless permitted by Subchapter F, Chapter 301, Labor
 Code, 34 C.F.R. Part 99, Subpart D, or commission rule, a person
 commits an offense if the person solicits, discloses, receives, or
 uses, or authorizes, permits, participates in, or acquiesces in
 another person's use of, student information.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *