Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2442 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2017

                    By: King of Hemphill H.B. No. 2442
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2442 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the minimum amount of student instruction required to
 be provided by public schools and education programs and
 calculation of average daily attendance for public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 25.081(a), (b), and (c), Education
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as authorized under [Subsection (b) of] this
 section, Section 25.084, or Section 29.0821, for each school year
 each school district must operate so that the district provides for
 at least 180 days of instruction for students. A district may elect
 to provide less than 180 days of instruction for students if the
 district provides at least 75,600 minutes of instruction, including
 intermissions and recesses, for students.
 (b)  The commissioner may approve the instruction of
 students for fewer than the number of days or minutes required under
 Subsection (a) if disaster, flood, extreme weather conditions, fuel
 curtailment, or another calamity causes the closing of schools.
 (c)  If the commissioner does not approve reduced
 instruction time under Subsection (b), a school district may add
 additional days to the district's normal school calendar or
 additional minutes to the end of the district's normal school hours
 as necessary to compensate for days or minutes of instruction lost
 due to school closures caused by disaster, flood, extreme weather
 conditions, fuel curtailment, or another calamity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 25.082, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  A school day shall be at least seven hours each day,
 including intermissions and recesses, except as provided by
 Subsection (a-1).
 (a-1)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a campus that only
 operates a program authorized as a half-day program by law or by
 rule or to a charter school operating under Chapter 12.
 SECTION 3.  Section 42.005, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1), (g-1), and
 (i) through (o) to read as follows:
 (a)  In this chapter, average daily attendance is:
 (1)  the quotient of the sum of attendance for each day
 [of the minimum number of days] of instruction as described under
 Section 25.081(a) divided by the actual [minimum] number of days of
 instruction;
 (2)  for a district that operates under a flexible year
 program under Section 29.0821, the quotient of the sum of
 attendance for each actual day of instruction as permitted by
 Section 29.0821(b)(1) divided by the number of actual days of
 instruction as permitted by Section 29.0821(b)(1); or
 (3)  for a district that operates under a flexible
 school day program under Section 29.0822, the average daily
 attendance as calculated by the commissioner in accordance with
 Sections 29.0822(d) and (d-1).
 (a-1)  For purposes of calculating average daily attendance,
 a student is eligible for inclusion on the basis of a full day of
 attendance if the student is enrolled for at least 240 minutes of
 instructional time.
 (g-1)  The commissioner shall adopt rules to calculate
 average daily attendance for students participating in a blended
 learning program in which classroom instruction is supplemented
 with applied workforce learning opportunities, including
 participation of students in internships, externships, and
 apprenticeships.
 (i)  A district or a charter school operating under Chapter
 12 that operates a prekindergarten program is eligible to receive
 one-half of average daily attendance under Subsection (a) if the
 district's or charter school's prekindergarten program provides at
 least:
 (1)  32,400 minutes of instructional time to students;
 or
 (2)  180 days of instruction to students, with a number
 of hours of instruction per day that results in the equivalent of
 32,400 minutes of instructional time.
 (j)  A district or charter school is eligible to earn full
 average daily attendance under Subsection (a) if the district or
 school provides at least 43,200 minutes of instructional time to
 students enrolled in:
 (1)  a dropout recovery school or program operating
 under Section 12.1141(c) or Section 39.0548;
 (2)  an alternative education program operating under
 Section 37.008, if Section 25.082(a) does not apply to the program;
 (3)  a school program located at a day treatment
 facility, residential treatment facility, psychiatric hospital, or
 medical hospital;
 (4)  a school program offered at a correctional
 facility; or
 (5)  a school operating under Section 29.259.
 (k)  A charter school operating under a charter granted under
 Chapter 12 before September 1, 2015, is eligible to earn full
 average daily attendance under Subsection (a), as that subsection
 existed immediately before September 1, 2015, for:
 (1)  all campuses of the charter school operating
 before September 1, 2015; and
 (2)  any campus or site expansion approved on or after
 September 1, 2015.
 (l)  A school district campus described by Section
 25.082(a-1) or charter school may operate more than one program and
 be eligible for full average daily attendance for each program if
 the programs operated by the district campus or charter school
 satisfy all applicable state and federal requirements.
 (m)  In accordance with rules adopted by the commissioner,
 each charter school operating under Chapter 12 shall notify the
 commissioner if the charter school will provide:
 (1)  at least 180 days of instruction for students; or
 (2)  less than 180 days of instruction for students,
 but at least 75,600 minutes of instruction, including intermissions
 and recess.
 (n)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section, including rules that:
 (1)  establish the minimum amount of instructional time
 per day that allows a school district or charter school to be
 eligible for full average daily attendance, which may differ based
 on the instructional program offered by the district or charter
 school;
 (2)  establish the requirements necessary for a school
 district or charter school to be eligible for one-half of average
 daily attendance, which may differ based on the instructional
 program offered by the district or charter school; and
 (3)  proportionally reduce the average daily
 attendance for a school district if any campus or instructional
 program in the district provides fewer than the required minimum
 days or minutes of instruction to students.
 (o)  To assist school districts in implementing this section
 as amended by H.B. 2442, Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2017, or similar legislation, the commissioner may waive a
 requirement of this section or adopt rules to implement this
 section.  This subsection expires at the end of the 2018-2019 school
 year.
 SECTION 4.  Section 25.081(e), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *