Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2445 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Stucky (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2445
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2, 1 present not voting;
 May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.101(a), Tax Code, as amended by
 Chapters 666 (H.B. 3772) and 979 (H.B. 3615), Acts of the 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Revenue from the municipal hotel occupancy tax may be
 used only to promote tourism and the convention and hotel industry,
 and that use is limited to the following:
 (1)  the acquisition of sites for and the construction,
 improvement, enlarging, equipping, repairing, operation, and
 maintenance of convention center facilities or visitor information
 centers, or both;
 (2)  the furnishing of facilities, personnel, and
 materials for the registration of convention delegates or
 registrants;
 (3)  advertising and conducting solicitations and
 promotional programs to attract tourists and convention delegates
 or registrants to the municipality or its vicinity;
 (4)  the encouragement, promotion, improvement, and
 application of the arts, including instrumental and vocal music,
 dance, drama, folk art, creative writing, architecture, design and
 allied fields, painting, sculpture, photography, graphic and craft
 arts, motion pictures, radio, television, tape and sound recording,
 and other arts related to the presentation, performance, execution,
 and exhibition of these major art forms;
 (5)  historical restoration and preservation projects
 or activities or advertising and conducting solicitations and
 promotional programs to encourage tourists and convention
 delegates to visit preserved historic sites or museums:
 (A)  at or in the immediate vicinity of convention
 center facilities or visitor information centers; or
 (B)  located elsewhere in the municipality or its
 vicinity that would be frequented by tourists and convention
 delegates;
 (6)  for a municipality located in a county with a
 population of one million or less, expenses, including promotion
 expenses, directly related to a sporting event in which the
 majority of participants are tourists who substantially increase
 economic activity at hotels and motels within the municipality or
 its vicinity;
 (7)  subject to Section 351.1076, the promotion of
 tourism by the enhancement and upgrading of existing sports
 facilities or fields, including facilities or fields for baseball,
 softball, soccer, flag football, and rodeos, if:
 (A)  the municipality owns the facilities or
 fields;
 (B)  the municipality:
 (i)  has a population of 80,000 or more and
 is located in a county that has a population of 350,000 or less;
 (ii)  has a population of at least 75,000 but
 not more than 95,000 and is located in a county that has a
 population of less than 200,000 but more than 160,000;
 (iii)  has a population of at least 36,000
 but not more than 39,000 and is located in a county that has a
 population of 100,000 or less that is not adjacent to a county with
 a population of more than two million;
 (iv)  has a population of at least 13,000 but
 less than 39,000 and is located in a county that has a population of
 at least 200,000;
 (v)  has a population of at least 70,000 but
 less than 90,000 and no part of which is located in a county with a
 population greater than 150,000;
 (vi)  is located in a county that:
 (a)  is adjacent to the Texas-Mexico
 border;
 (b)  has a population of at least
 500,000; and
 (c)  does not have a municipality with
 a population greater than 500,000;
 (vii)  has a population of at least 25,000
 but not more than 26,000 and is located in a county that has a
 population of 90,000 or less;
 (viii) [(ix)]  is located in a county that
 has a population of not more than 300,000 and in which a component
 university of the University of Houston System is located; [or]
 (ix) [(x)]  has a population of at least
 40,000 and the San Marcos River flows through the municipality; or
 (x)  contains an intersection of Interstates
 35E and 35W and at least two public universities; and
 (C)  the sports facilities and fields have been
 used, in the preceding calendar year, a combined total of more than
 10 times for district, state, regional, or national sports
 tournaments;
 (8)  for a municipality with a population of at least
 70,000 but less than 90,000, no part of which is located in a county
 with a population greater than 150,000, the construction,
 improvement, enlarging, equipping, repairing, operation, and
 maintenance of a coliseum or multiuse facility;
 (9)  signage directing the public to sights and
 attractions that are visited frequently by hotel guests in the
 municipality;
 (10)  the construction, improvement, enlarging,
 equipping, repairing, operation, and maintenance of a coliseum or
 multiuse facility, if the municipality:
 (A)  has a population of at least 90,000 but less
 than 120,000; and
 (B)  is located in two counties, at least one of
 which contains the headwaters of the San Gabriel River; and
 (11)  for a municipality with a population of more than
 175,000 but less than 225,000 that is located in two counties, each
 of which has a population of less than 200,000, the construction,
 improvement, enlarging, equipping, repairing, operation, and
 maintenance of a coliseum or multiuse facility and related
 infrastructure or a venue, as defined by Section 334.001(4), Local
 Government Code, that is related to the promotion of tourism.
 SECTION 2.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act controls
 over another Act of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *