Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2463 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2463
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring state agencies to develop written succession
 plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 321, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 321.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 321.024.  STATE AGENCY'S SUCCESSION PLAN. (a)  In this
 section, "state agency" has the meaning assigned by Section
 651.011.
 (b)  The State Auditor shall include in the State Auditor's
 annual report on classified employee turnover:
 (1)  a list of each state agency that has submitted a
 written succession plan under Section 651.011 to the State Auditor
 and each state agency that has failed to submit a written succession
 plan under that section; and
 (2)  a thorough and comprehensive summary of the types
 and extent of succession planning completed by state agencies.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 651, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 651.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 651.011.  SUCCESSION PLAN. (a)  In this section, "state
 agency" means a department, board, commission, or other agency in
 the executive branch of state government. The term does not include
 an institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code.
 (b)  A state agency shall develop a written succession plan:
 (1)  identifying and developing mechanisms to ensure
 the transfer of institutional knowledge from experienced and
 retiring employees who are not appointed by the governor or the
 governing body of the state agency to succeeding employees; and
 (2)  identifying the skills and abilities necessary for
 the development of the succeeding employees.
 (c)  At least annually, the state agency shall update the
 written succession plan developed under Subsection (b). The updated
 written succession plan must include a report on the implementation
 of the mechanisms, skills, and abilities identified and developed
 in the previous written succession plan.
 (d)  A state agency shall include in the state agency's
 legislative appropriations request a provision stating whether the
 state agency has developed a written succession plan as required by
 Subsection (b).
 (e)  Not later than September 1 of each year, a state agency
 shall submit the written succession plan required under Subsection
 (b) to the state auditor and post the written succession plan on the
 state agency's Internet website.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than September 1, 2018, a state agency
 under Section 651.011, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall
 submit the agency's initial succession plan as required by that
 section.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *