Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2468 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R9438 JRR-D
 By: Davis of Harris H.B. No. 2468


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the assessments used by the Board of Pardons
 and Paroles to make parole decisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 508.1446 to read as follows:
 Sec. 508.1446.  STUDY ON ASSESSMENTS USED DURING PAROLE
 DECISIONS. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the
 effectiveness of the assessments used by the board and parole
 panels in determining, for purposes of making parole decisions
 under this chapter, an inmate's risk of recidivism.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the board shall, at a minimum,
 use information for inmates considered for parole during the period
 beginning January 1, 2015, and ending December 31, 2017.
 (c)  In evaluating the effectiveness of the assessments, the
 board shall analyze the number and percentage of inmates released
 on parole who:
 (1)  are convicted of a misdemeanor offense following
 release on parole;
 (2)  are convicted of a felony offense following
 release on parole; or
 (3)  have parole revoked for a reason other than a new
 conviction.
 (d)  Not later than January 1, 2019, the board shall submit a
 report on the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and each member of the legislature. The report must
 include any recommendations the board considers necessary to
 improve the parole decision-making process, including any changes
 to the assessments used or the parole guidelines or recommended
 parole approval rates described by Section 508.144.
 (e)  This section expires August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.