Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2534 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 6, 2017      TO: Honorable John Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2534 by Kuempel (Relating to certain real estate sales, brokerage, and advertising activities, certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission, and the authorization of a ground lease with the Texas Facilities Commission to construct or maintain a building.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2534, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.  

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 6, 2017





  TO: Honorable John Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2534 by Kuempel (Relating to certain real estate sales, brokerage, and advertising activities, certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission, and the authorization of a ground lease with the Texas Facilities Commission to construct or maintain a building.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable John Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2534 by Kuempel (Relating to certain real estate sales, brokerage, and advertising activities, certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission, and the authorization of a ground lease with the Texas Facilities Commission to construct or maintain a building.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable John Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Honorable John Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2534 by Kuempel (Relating to certain real estate sales, brokerage, and advertising activities, certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission, and the authorization of a ground lease with the Texas Facilities Commission to construct or maintain a building.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2534 by Kuempel (Relating to certain real estate sales, brokerage, and advertising activities, certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission, and the authorization of a ground lease with the Texas Facilities Commission to construct or maintain a building.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2534, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.  

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2534, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 ($750,000)   2021 ($750,000)   2022 ($750,000)    


2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 ($750,000)
2021 ($750,000)
2022 ($750,000)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 ($750,000)   2021 ($750,000)   2022 ($750,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 ($750,000)   2021 ($750,000)   2022 ($750,000)  


2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 ($750,000)
2021 ($750,000)
2022 ($750,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Occupations Code and Property Code relating to certain real estate brokerage and advertising activities and to certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission (TREC), and the authorization of a ground lease with the Texas Facilities Commission (TFC) to construct or maintain a building.Effective September 1, 2019, the bill would reduce the $750,000 that TREC is required to remit to the General Revenue Fund each year by amounts expended each fiscal year to construct or maintain a building in the Capitol Complex, including for repayment of a construction loan, to be developed, constructed, maintained, and operated in conjunction with TFC. This provision would remain in effect until September 1, 2029.The bill would authorize TFC to enter into a ground lease with TREC for the purposes of construction of a building in the Capitol Complex, as specified in the bill.Except as otherwise specified, the bill would take effect September 1, 2017.

Methodology

The Comptroller of Public Accounts (CPA) assumes in its analysis that TREC will enter into a lease with TFC for and begin construction on a building in the Capitol Complex in fiscal year 2020, as authorized by the bill, and that its annual expenditures related to construction and maintenance of the building would exceed $750,000, such that annual revenue to General Revenue would be reduced by $750,000 beginning in fiscal year 2020. Based on the analysis of TFC, duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.TREC is a self-directed, semi-independent agency; therefore, any agency costs or savings associated with implementing the provisions of the bill are not considered in this analysis. 

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 303 Facilities Commission, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 329 Real Estate Commission

303 Facilities Commission, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 329 Real Estate Commission

LBB Staff: UP, CL, EH, AO, JSm

 UP, CL, EH, AO, JSm