Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2619 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Giddings, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2619
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 17, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to grant programs to maintain peace officers' mental
 health and provide critical incident stress debriefing for certain
 officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 772.0073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.0073.  PEACE OFFICER MENTAL HEALTH GRANT PROGRAM.
 (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of the
 state or an agency of a political subdivision of the state
 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
 (2)  "Criminal justice division" means the criminal
 justice division established under Section 772.006.
 (b)  The criminal justice division shall establish and
 administer a grant program through which a law enforcement agency
 may apply for a grant to implement programs, practices, and
 services designed to address the direct or indirect emotional harm
 suffered by peace officers employed by the law enforcement agency
 in the course of the officers' duties or as the result of the
 commission of crimes by other persons.
 (c)  Grant money awarded under this section may be used to
 pay for:
 (1)  mental health counseling and other mental health
 care;
 (2)  personnel costs incurred by the department as a
 result of providing direct services and supporting activities under
 an implemented program, practice, or service;
 (3)  skills training for department personnel related
 to providing direct services under an implemented program,
 practice, or service; and
 (4)  evaluation of an implemented program, practice, or
 service to determine its effectiveness.
 (d)  Information obtained in the administration of a
 program, practice, or service funded by a grant made under this
 section is confidential and is not subject to disclosure under
 Chapter 552.
 (e)  A law enforcement agency may not use against a peace
 officer in a departmental proceeding any information obtained in
 the administration of a program, practice, or service funded by a
 grant made under this section.
 (f)  The criminal justice division shall establish:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
 (2)  grant application procedures;
 (3)  guidelines relating to grant amounts;
 (4)  procedures for evaluating grant applications; and
 (5)  procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
 awarded under the program and ensuring compliance with any
 conditions of a grant.
 (g)  The criminal justice division shall evaluate and
 compare the programs, practices, and services implemented by each
 law enforcement agency that receives a grant under this section to
 determine the most successful programs, practices, and services for
 maintaining the mental health of peace officers.
 (h)  The criminal justice division may contract with a third
 party to conduct the evaluations and comparison described by
 Subsection (g).
 (i)  The criminal justice division shall include in the
 biennial report required by Section 772.006(a)(9) a detailed
 reporting of the results and performance of the grant program
 administered under this section.
 (j)  The criminal justice division may use any available
 funds to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 772.0074 to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.0074.  CRITICAL INCIDENT STRESS DEBRIEFING GRANT
 PROGRAM. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Criminal justice division" means the criminal
 justice division established under Section 772.006.
 (2)  "Critical incident" means an incident involving a
 peace officer that occurs while the officer is performing official
 duties and that results in serious bodily injury to the officer or
 poses a substantial risk of serious bodily injury or death to the
 officer or of serious harm to the officer's mental health or
 well-being.
 (3)  "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of the
 state or an agency of a political subdivision of the state that is
 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
 (4)  "Peace officer" has the meaning assigned by
 Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (b)  The criminal justice division shall establish and
 administer a grant program to assist law enforcement agencies in
 providing critical incident stress debriefing to peace officers who
 experience critical incidents while performing official duties.
 (c)  The criminal justice division may award a grant under
 this section to:
 (1)  a law enforcement agency for the agency to provide
 critical incident stress debriefing to peace officers employed by
 the agency; or
 (2)  any other agency, organization with a focus on
 mental health or trauma-related issues, or university with relevant
 expertise and experience to assist in providing support for the
 grant program, including support related to the development,
 implementation, management, or evaluation of the grant program, as
 determined necessary by the division.
 (d)  A law enforcement agency that receives a grant under
 this section must:
 (1)  inform each peace officer employed by the agency
 about:
 (A)  the program, including opportunities to
 participate in the program; and
 (B)  if the officer participates in the program,
 the confidentiality protections described by Subsection (e); and
 (2)  certify in writing that the agency will not use
 disciplinary action or any other form of punishment, including the
 refusal of a promotion, to discourage or prohibit an officer's
 participation in the critical incident stress debriefing offered by
 the agency.
 (e)  Critical incident stress debriefing provided using
 money distributed under the grant program is subject to the
 confidentiality protections provided under Section 784.003, Health
 and Safety Code.
 (f)  The criminal justice division shall establish:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
 (2)  grant application procedures;
 (3)  procedures for evaluating grant applications;
 (4)  the minimum qualifications necessary for a person
 to conduct critical incident stress debriefing that is provided
 using money distributed under the grant program; and
 (5)  guidance for the development of critical incident
 stress debriefing curricula, materials, and best practices.
 (g)  The criminal justice division shall include in the
 biennial report required by Section 772.006(a)(9) a detailed
 reporting of the results and performance of the grant program
 administered under this section.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than October 1, 2017, the criminal
 justice division of the governor's office shall establish the grant
 program required by Section 772.0074, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, and, not later than January 1, 2018, shall begin to award
 grants under the program.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *