Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2662 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2017

                    85R23472 SLB-F
 By: Landgraf H.B. No. 2662
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2662:
 By:  Pickett C.S.H.B. No. 2662


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact
 waste disposal facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 401.207, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (e) and (e-2) and adding Subsection
 (l) to read as follows:
 (e)  The compact waste disposal facility license holder may
 not collect a fee under this section or enter into a contract for
 the disposal of nonparty low-level radioactive waste that has been
 designated as Class A low-level radioactive waste under 10 C.F.R.
 Section 61.55 and commission rule unless the waste is
 containerized.  [The compact waste disposal facility license holder
 may collect a fee and dispose of:
 [(1)  not more than the greater of:
 [(A)     1.167 million   curies of   nonparty compact
 waste; or
 [(B)     an amount of   nonparty compact waste equal to
 30   percent of   the initial   licensed capacity of   the facility;   and
 [(2)     not more than 275,000   curies of   nonparty compact
 waste in   any fiscal year.]
 (e-2)  The commission's executive director, on completion of
 a [the] study under Section 401.208, may prohibit the license
 holder from continuing to accept [accepting any additional]
 nonparty compact waste if the commission determines from the study
 that the capacity of the facility will be limited[, regardless of
 whether the limit under Subsection (f) has been reached].
 (l)  This section does not restrict or alter the authority of
 the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission
 under this chapter or Chapter 403 to review, approve, deny, or place
 conditions on the importation of nonparty compact waste to this
 state.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 401.208(a), (c), and (e), Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  At least once every four years, the [The] commission
 shall conduct a study on the available volume and curie capacity of
 the compact waste disposal facility for the disposal of party state
 compact waste and nonparty compact waste.
 (c)  The [Not later than December 1, 2016, the] commission
 shall submit a final report of the results of the study to the
 standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives
 with jurisdiction over the disposal of low-level radioactive waste.
 (e)  The commission may conduct a study described by
 Subsection (a) at any time [after December 1, 2012,] if the
 commission determines that a study is necessary.
 SECTION 3.  Section 401.216(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  [The commission may license the compact waste disposal
 facility   license holder to dispose of   federal facility   waste.]  The
 commission may license federal facility waste disposal only at a
 separate and distinct facility that is operated exclusively for the
 disposal of federal facility waste and that is adjacent to the
 compact waste disposal facility.
 SECTION 4.  Section 401.2456(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Rates negotiated under this section must be set both by
 a price per curie and a price per cubic foot.  Fees resulting from
 the negotiated rates must be greater than[, as applicable:
 [(1)]  the compact waste disposal fees under Section
 401.245 as set by the commission that are in effect at the time the
 rates are negotiated[; or
 [(2)     the interim compact waste disposal fees under
 Section 401.2455 as set by the commission's executive director that
 are in effect at the time the rates are negotiated].
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 403, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 403.0056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0056.  COMPACT FACILITY CAPACITY.  (a)  In this
 section, "compact facility," "generator," "operator," and "party
 state" have the meanings assigned by the Texas Low-Level
 Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact.
 (b)  The operator shall reserve disposal capacity in the
 amounts of four million cubic feet and three million curies for
 party state compact waste.  The reserved capacity and curies are
 immediately set aside for party state compact waste.  The
 commission, the operator, and the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality shall ensure that:
 (1)  the reservation is maintained until the completion
 of decommissioning of all the nuclear electric generation
 facilities in the party states; and
 (2)  20 percent of the volume and curie capacity
 reserved for party states is allotted to compact waste generated in
 Vermont.
 (c)  For the purposes of operator licensing decisions based
 on storage capacity, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall consider the disposal capacity reserved for party state
 compact waste under Subsection (b) as disposed.
 (d)  When the compact facility reaches 80 percent of its
 as-built disposal capacity as measured by volume or curie, or when
 one of the party state nuclear electric generation facilities
 executes a contract for decommissioning, the operator shall
 discontinue accepting waste from nonparty states until:
 (1)  construction is completed on a new disposal cell
 that provides at least an additional one million cubic feet of
 airspace capacity, as certified and stamped by an individual
 licensed as an engineer under Chapter 1001, Occupations Code; or
 (2)  the operator executes a performance bond or other
 instrument of financial assurance determined to be acceptable by
 the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality that is conditioned
 on the completion of a new disposal cell at the compact facility.
 (e)  This section does not restrict or alter the authority
 of:
 (1)  the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 under Chapter 401 to regulate the operator in accordance with
 license terms or agency rules; or
 (2)  the commission under Chapter 401 or this chapter
 to review, approve, deny, or place conditions on the importation of
 nonparty compact waste to this state.
 SECTION 6.  The following sections of the Health and Safety
 Code are repealed:
 (1)  Section 401.005;
 (2)  Sections 401.207(d-1), (d-2), (d-3), (e-1), and
 (f);
 (3)  Sections 401.216(b), (c), and (e); and
 (4)  Section 401.2455.
 SECTION 7.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall submit the first report required under Section 401.208,
 Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later than
 December 1, 2020.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.