Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2662 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/06/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Landgraf H.B. No. 2662


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact
 waste disposal facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 401.208(a), (c), and (e), Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  At least once every four years, the [The] commission
 shall conduct a study on the available volume and curie capacity of
 the compact waste disposal facility for the disposal of party state
 compact waste and nonparty compact waste.
 (c)  The [Not later than December 1, 2016, the] commission
 shall submit a final report of the results of the study to the
 standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives
 with jurisdiction over the disposal of low-level radioactive waste.
 (e)  The commission may conduct a study described by
 Subsection (a) at any time [after December 1, 2012,] if the
 commission determines that a study is necessary.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall submit the first report required under Section 401.208,
 Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later than
 December 1, 2020.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.