Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2662 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Landgraf (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2662
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2662 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact
 waste disposal facility; reducing a surcharge; eliminating a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Section 401.207(g), Health and Safety Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (g)  The commission shall assess a surcharge for the disposal
 of nonparty compact waste at the compact waste disposal
 facility.  The surcharge is 10 [20] percent of the total contracted
 rate under Section 401.2456 and must be assessed in addition to the
 total contracted rate under that section.
 (b)  Effective September 1, 2019, Section 401.207(g), Health
 and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (g)  The commission shall assess a surcharge for the disposal
 of nonparty compact waste at the compact waste disposal
 facility.  The surcharge is 20 percent of the total contracted rate
 under Section 401.2456 and must be assessed in addition to the total
 contracted rate under that section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 401.208, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (c), and (e) and adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  At least once every four years, the [The] commission
 shall conduct a study on the available volume and curie capacity of
 the compact waste disposal facility for the disposal of party state
 compact waste and nonparty compact waste.
 (a-1)  In order to conduct the study under this section, the
 commission may require a generator of low-level radioactive waste
 to provide annually:
 (1)  information reasonably necessary to evaluate the
 adequacy of the capacity of the compact waste disposal facility as
 accurately as possible, including the amount in volume and curies
 that the generator intends to export or dispose of at a facility
 other than the compact waste disposal facility;
 (2)  the amount in volume and curies of low-level
 radioactive waste that was stored on-site at the generator's
 facility in the preceding year; and
 (3)  the length of time waste was stored at the
 generator's facility.
 (c)  The [Not later than December 1, 2016, the] commission
 shall submit a final report of the results of the study to the
 standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives
 with jurisdiction over the disposal of low-level radioactive waste.
 (e)  The commission may conduct a study described by
 Subsection (a) at any time [after December 1, 2012,] if the
 commission determines that a study is necessary.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Section 401.2445, Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 (b)  Effective September 1, 2019, Subchapter F, Chapter 401,
 Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 401.2445 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 401.2445.  STATE FEE. The compact waste disposal
 facility license holder each quarter shall transfer to the state
 general revenue fund five percent of the gross receipts from:
 (1)  compact waste received at the compact waste
 disposal facility; and
 (2)  any federal facility waste received at a federal
 facility waste disposal facility licensed under Section 401.216.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 403, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 403.0056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0056.  ASSESSMENT OF COMPACT FACILITY BY
 LEGISLATIVE OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE. (a) In this section, "compact
 facility" has the meaning assigned by the Texas Low-Level
 Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact.
 (b)  A legislative oversight committee is created for the
 purpose of assessing the compact facility.
 (c)  The committee is composed of the following members:
 (1)  the chair of the House Committee on Environmental
 Regulation;
 (2)  a member of the house of representatives who
 represents the county in which the compact facility is located;
 (3)  a member of the house of representatives appointed
 by the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (4)  the chair of the Senate Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development;
 (5)  a member of the senate who represents the county in
 which the compact facility is located;
 (6)  a member of the senate appointed by the lieutenant
 governor;
 (7)  the chair of the commission; and
 (8)  a person appointed by each nonhost party state as
 provided by the laws of that state.
 (d)  The chair of the House Committee on Environmental
 Regulation and the chair of the Senate Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development shall serve as co-chairs.
 (e)  An appointed member of the committee serves at the
 pleasure of the appointing official.
 (f)  The committee shall consider and make recommendations
 regarding:
 (1)  the annual fixed costs incurred by the operator of
 the compact facility;
 (2)  the party state compact waste disposal fees
 established in rule by the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality in accordance with Section 401.245;
 (3)  the contract review process as carried out by the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality;
 (4)  the relationship between the state, party state
 generators, and operator as it relates to the operation of the
 compact facility;
 (5)  the contingency plan required under the Texas
 Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact;
 (6)  the need for and effects of fees and surcharges
 assessed for disposal of waste in the compact facility, including
 the fees and surcharges assessed under the following sections:
 (A)  Section 401.052(b)(5);
 (B)  Section 401.207(g);
 (C)  Section 401.245; and
 (D)  Section 401.246(a)(6);
 (7)  the cost of a state-run compact facility and the
 effect a state-run facility would have on rates and generators in
 compact states; and
 (8)  any other matters the committee determines are
 relevant to the compact facility and oversight of the compact
 facility.
 (g)  The committee may request reports and other information
 from the commission and the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality as necessary to carry out this section.
 (h)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the committee shall
 submit a final report of the results of the assessment to the
 committees of the senate and the house of representatives with
 jurisdiction over the disposal of low-level radioactive waste.
 (i)  The committee is abolished and this section expires
 December 31, 2018.
 SECTION 5.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall submit the first report required under Section 401.208,
 Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later than
 December 1, 2020.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *