Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB273 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Gonzales of Williamson, et al. H.B. No. 273
 (Senate Sponsor - Campbell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the content of local and state propositions on the
 ballot.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.095, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 52.095.  PROPOSITIONS. (a) Except as otherwise
 provided by law, the authority ordering an election in which more
 than one measure is to be voted on shall determine the order in
 which the propositions are to appear on the ballot and identify them
 as follows:
 (1)  except as provided by Subdivision (2), for each
 proposition on the ballot, the authority ordering the election
 shall assign a letter of the alphabet to the measure that
 corresponds to its order on the ballot; and
 (2)  for each proposition on the ballot to be voted on
 statewide, the authority ordering the election shall assign a
 number to the measure that corresponds to its order on the ballot.
 (b)  Each proposition on the ballot must identify the name of
 the authority ordering the election on the measure.
 (c)  The secretary of state shall prescribe procedures
 necessary to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 274, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 274.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 274.004.  PROPOSITION BALLOT ORDER. A proposed
 constitutional amendment must be placed on the ballot before all
 other propositions.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *