Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2730 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/02/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R11956 KJE-D
 By: Lucio III H.B. No. 2730


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the commissioner of education to
 create career and technical credentials and certificates that may
 be earned through a career and technology education program and to a
 study to identify unmet needs in career and technology education
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 29.1821 and 29.193 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.1821.  COMMISSIONER AUTHORITY TO CREATE CREDENTIALS
 AND CERTIFICATES. (a)  To address unmet workforce needs and enhance
 student competitiveness in the labor market, the commissioner may
 create career and technical credentials or certificates that may be
 earned by a public high school student through a career and
 technology education program.
 (a-1)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the commissioner
 shall create at least one credential or certificate in information
 technology in accordance with the results of the study conducted
 under Section 29.193. This subsection expires September 1, 2021.
 (b)  A credential or certificate created under this section
 must:
 (1)  be aligned with state and regional workforce needs
 in the applicable field; and
 (2)  serve as an entry point for employment or a bridge
 to postsecondary education in the applicable field.
 (c)  The commissioner may consult with relevant stakeholders
 in creating credentials or certificates under this section.
 (d)  The agency shall post on the agency's Internet website
 information regarding any credentials or certificates created by
 the commissioner under this section.
 Sec. 29.193.  STUDY AND REPORT TO IDENTIFY UNMET NEEDS. (a)
 The agency shall conduct a study to identify unmet needs in career
 and technology education programs offered to public high school
 students. The agency shall include in the study programs in the
 information technology career cluster and in any other career
 cluster selected by the agency.
 (b)  The study must, for each career cluster included in the
 study:
 (1)  evaluate:
 (A)  the industry-recognized credentials or
 certificates in the career cluster currently being offered to
 public high school students through career and technology education
 programs; and
 (B)  the knowledge and skills in the career
 cluster necessary to meet state and regional workforce needs; and
 (2)  identify:
 (A)  any gaps between the industry-recognized
 credentials or certificates identified under Subdivision (1)(A)
 and the knowledge and skills identified under Subdivision (1)(B);
 and
 (B)  any knowledge or skills that could be
 incorporated into career and technology education programs in the
 career cluster to increase students' marketability in that field
 after graduation from high school.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2019, the agency shall
 submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives a report on the study and any
 recommendations for legislative or other action. The report must
 identify each credential or certificate, including at least one
 credential or certificate in information technology, to be created
 by the commissioner under Section 29.1821 as a result of the study.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2020.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.