By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2776 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017; May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2776 By: Creighton A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the right of certain appellants to supersede a judgment or order on appeal. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 22.004, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (i) to read as follows: (i) The supreme court shall adopt rules to provide that the right of an appellant under Section 6.001(b)(1), (2), or (3), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, to supersede a judgment or order on appeal is not subject to being counter-superseded under Rule 24.2(a)(3), Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure, or any other rule. Counter-supersedeas shall remain available to parties in a lawsuit concerning a matter that was the basis of a contested case in an administrative enforcement action. SECTION 2. The Texas Supreme Court shall adopt the rules required by Section 22.004(i), Government Code, as added by this Act, before May 1, 2018. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *