Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2776 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2776
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2776 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right of certain appellants to supersede a judgment
 or order on appeal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.004, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The supreme court shall adopt rules to provide that the
 right of an appellant under Section 6.001(b)(1), (2), or (3), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, to supersede a judgment or order on
 appeal is not subject to being counter-superseded under Rule
 24.2(a)(3), Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure, or any other rule.
 Counter-supersedeas shall remain available to parties in a lawsuit
 concerning a matter that was the basis of a contested case in an
 administrative enforcement action.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Supreme Court shall adopt the rules
 required by Section 22.004(i), Government Code, as added by this
 Act, before May 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *