Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2776 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2776


 AN ACT
 relating to the right of certain appellants to supersede a judgment
 or order on appeal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.004, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The supreme court shall adopt rules to provide that the
 right of an appellant under Section 6.001(b)(1), (2), or (3), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, to supersede a judgment or order on
 appeal is not subject to being counter-superseded under Rule
 24.2(a)(3), Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure, or any other rule.
 Counter-supersedeas shall remain available to parties in a lawsuit
 concerning a matter that was the basis of a contested case in an
 administrative enforcement action.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Supreme Court shall adopt the rules
 required by Section 22.004(i), Government Code, as added by this
 Act, before May 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2776 was passed by the House on May 6,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2776 on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2776 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 26, Nays
 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor