Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB278 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 1, 2017      TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB278 by Howard (Relating to the establishment of the task force on asylum-seeking children.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Chapter 403 of the Government Code to establish a task force on asylum-seeking children. The task force would be required to study the humanitarian and fiscal impacts of asylum-seeking children from Central America in this state and to produce a report outlining the status of asylum-seeking children. The task force would be required to partner with an independent third party to produce the report. The Comptroller would be authorized to accept gifts, grants, and donations to carry out the purposes of the task force; the bill would specify that the Comptroller is not required to convene the task force to produce the report if sufficient private funds are not available. The report would be submitted to certain state and federal officials not later than October 1, 2018. The task force would be abolished on December 31, 2018. The bill would take effect immediately upon receipt of a two-thirds vote of all members elected to each house; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2017.The Comptroller indicates that costs to implement the bill's provisions could be absorbed within existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 405 Department of Public Safety, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 701 Texas Education Agency   LBB Staff:  UP, AG, NV, LCO    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 1, 2017





  TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB278 by Howard (Relating to the establishment of the task force on asylum-seeking children.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB278 by Howard (Relating to the establishment of the task force on asylum-seeking children.), As Introduced

 Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs 

 Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB278 by Howard (Relating to the establishment of the task force on asylum-seeking children.), As Introduced

HB278 by Howard (Relating to the establishment of the task force on asylum-seeking children.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Chapter 403 of the Government Code to establish a task force on asylum-seeking children. The task force would be required to study the humanitarian and fiscal impacts of asylum-seeking children from Central America in this state and to produce a report outlining the status of asylum-seeking children. The task force would be required to partner with an independent third party to produce the report. The Comptroller would be authorized to accept gifts, grants, and donations to carry out the purposes of the task force; the bill would specify that the Comptroller is not required to convene the task force to produce the report if sufficient private funds are not available. The report would be submitted to certain state and federal officials not later than October 1, 2018. The task force would be abolished on December 31, 2018. The bill would take effect immediately upon receipt of a two-thirds vote of all members elected to each house; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2017.The Comptroller indicates that costs to implement the bill's provisions could be absorbed within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 405 Department of Public Safety, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 701 Texas Education Agency

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 405 Department of Public Safety, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 701 Texas Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, AG, NV, LCO

 UP, AG, NV, LCO