Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB281 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 20, 2017      TO: Honorable Joe Moody, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB281 by Howard (Relating to establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sex offense.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB281, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,465,761) through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 20, 2017





  TO: Honorable Joe Moody, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB281 by Howard (Relating to establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sex offense.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joe Moody, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB281 by Howard (Relating to establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sex offense.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joe Moody, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Joe Moody, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB281 by Howard (Relating to establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sex offense.), As Introduced

HB281 by Howard (Relating to establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sex offense.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB281, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,465,761) through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB281, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,465,761) through the biennium ending August 31, 2019.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2018 ($1,227,576)   2019 ($238,185)   2020 ($238,185)   2021 ($238,185)   2022 ($238,185)    


2018 ($1,227,576)
2019 ($238,185)
2020 ($238,185)
2021 ($238,185)
2022 ($238,185)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2018 ($1,227,576)   2019 ($238,185)   2020 ($238,185)   2021 ($238,185)   2022 ($238,185)   

  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2018 ($1,227,576)   2019 ($238,185)   2020 ($238,185)   2021 ($238,185)   2022 ($238,185)  


2018 ($1,227,576)
2019 ($238,185)
2020 ($238,185)
2021 ($238,185)
2022 ($238,185)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government Code to require the Department of Public Safety (DPS) to develop and implement a statewide electronic tracking system for collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sex offense.Not later than September 1, 2019, the bill would require any entity that collects evidence, investigates, or prosecutes a sexual assault or other sex offense to participate in the tracking system. The bill would also require survivors from whom evidence was collected to have access to the system.The bill would take effect on September 1, 2017.

Methodology

It is assumed that DPS would require additional resources to implement the provisions of the bill in fiscal year 2018. It is estimated that DPS has sufficient agency staff and resources to maintain and to absorb ongoing maintenance costs beginning in fiscal year 2019. It is also assumed such costs would be out of the General Revenue Fund 01.

Technology

It is assumed that implementing the provisions of the bill would have a significant technology impact. DPS would contract with a third party vendor to establish a statewide tracking system, as required by the bill. Estimated costs total $1,227,576 in General Revenue Funds in fiscal year 2018 and $238,185 in maintenance costs each following year for items related to establishing the system, which include Track-Kit, Survivor Portal, Prosecutor Portal, Private Lab Portal, and an E-help Tech Support costs. It is estimated that DPS would require $20,857 in General Revenue Funds in fiscal year 2018 for Capital Expenditures related to implementation of the program.It is also assumed that DPS would require $95,121 to contract for professional services in fiscal year 2018 to facilitate the implementation of the program.

Local Government Impact

The bill could result in possible, if undetermined, fiscal impacts on local law enforcement agencies, to the degree local law enforcement agencies have sufficient technology systems to implement the provisions of the bill.

Source Agencies: 405 Department of Public Safety

405 Department of Public Safety

LBB Staff: UP, KJo, AI, FR, JAW, PM, WP, RC

 UP, KJo, AI, FR, JAW, PM, WP, RC