Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2825 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Gooden (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 2825
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2825 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of a levee improvement district by a
 commissioners court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 57, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 57.3295 to read as follows:
 Sec. 57.3295.  DISSOLUTION OF DISTRICT BY COMMISSIONERS
 COURT WITHOUT PETITION. (a)  The commissioners court of a county
 that contains a portion of the Trinity River may dissolve a district
 at any time if the court finds the following:
 (1)  the district has been dormant for more than five
 years;
 (2)  the physical boundaries of the district cannot be
 determined;
 (3)  the board of directors of the district is not
 active, or cannot be determined;
 (4)  property owners of the district cannot be
 determined; or
 (5)  a levee partially or completely inside the
 boundaries of the district has received a rating of unacceptable
 from the United States Army Corps of Engineers and the district has
 not undertaken, attempted to undertake, or made plans to undertake
 reasonable efforts to address the concerns of the United States
 Army Corps of Engineers.
 (b)  The commissioners court shall hold a public hearing
 before voting on a dissolution order. The hearing must be held not
 later than the seventh day before the date the dissolution order is
 subject to a vote by the commissioners court.
 (c)  Notice of the public hearing must be published in a
 regularly circulated newspaper within the county not later than the
 seventh day before the date the public hearing is scheduled to
 occur.
 (d)  If the commissioners court votes to dissolve the
 district, the commissioners court shall appoint the chairman of the
 board or some other suitable person as trustee to close the affairs
 of the district without delay, and shall determine the length of the
 term and the amount of compensation for the trustee.
 (e)  A district may not be dissolved under this section if
 the district:
 (1)  has any outstanding bonds or other indebtedness
 until that indebtedness has been repaid or defeased in accordance
 with the order or resolution authorizing the issuance of the bonds;
 or
 (2)  has a contractual obligation to pay money until
 that obligation has been paid fully in accordance with the
 contract.
 (f)  This section applies only to a commissioners court of a
 county that:
 (1)  has a population of not less than 2.2 million and
 that is adjacent to a county with a population of not less than 1.8
 million;
 (2)  has a population of not more than 200,000 and that
 contains a portion of Joe Pool Lake;
 (3)  has a population of not less than 47,000 and that
 contains a portion of the Richland Chambers Reservoir; or
 (4)  has a population of not less than 100,000 and that
 contains a portion of the Cedar Creek Reservoir.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 57.322, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 57.322.  REQUIREMENTS FOR DISSOLVING A DISTRICT BY
 PETITION.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *