Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB284 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 284


 AN ACT
 relating to authorization for certain health care facilities to
 secure residents with wheelchair self-release seat belts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 322, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 322.0515 to read as follows:
 Sec. 322.0515.  AUTHORIZATION FOR USE OF WHEELCHAIR
 SELF-RELEASE SEAT BELT; EXCEPTION.  (a) Except as provided by
 Subsection (b) and notwithstanding Section 322.051, a facility
 shall allow a resident to use a wheelchair self-release seat belt
 while the resident is in the resident's wheelchair if:
 (1)  the resident demonstrates the ability to release
 and fasten the seat belt without assistance;
 (2)  the use of the wheelchair self-release seat belt
 complies with the resident's plan of care; and
 (3)  the facility receives written authorization
 signed by the resident or the resident's legal guardian for the
 resident to use the wheelchair self-release seat belt.
 (b)  A facility that advertises as a restraint-free facility
 is not required to comply with Subsection (a) if the facility:
 (1)  provides to current and prospective residents a
 written disclosure stating the facility is restraint-free and is
 not required to comply with a request under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  makes all reasonable efforts to accommodate the
 concerns of a resident who requests a seat belt under Subsection
 (a).
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act but not later than January 1, 2018, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules necessary to implement this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Section 322.0515, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to the use of a wheelchair
 self-release seat belt occurring on or after January 1, 2018. Use
 of a wheelchair self-release seat belt occurring before that date
 is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 284 was passed by the House on April
 6, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 284 on May 25, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 130, Nays 12,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 284 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor