Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2848 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Burkett, Bonnen of Galveston H.B. No. 2848
 (Senate Sponsor - Perry)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2848 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to consultations with contracted physician networks and
 physician systems during certain investigations of child abuse and
 neglect.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 261, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 261.3017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 261.3017.  CONSULTATION WITH PHYSICIAN NETWORKS AND
 SYSTEMS REGARDING CERTAIN MEDICAL CONDITIONS. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Network" means the Forensic Assessment Center
 Network.
 (2)  "System" means the entities that receive grants
 under the Texas Medical Child Abuse Resources and Education System
 (MEDCARES) authorized by Chapter 1001, Health and Safety Code.
 (b)  Any agreement between the department and the network or
 between the Department of State Health Services and the system to
 provide assistance in connection with abuse and neglect
 investigations conducted by the department must require the network
 and the system to have the ability to obtain consultations with
 physicians, including radiologists, geneticists, and
 endocrinologists, who specialize in identifying unique health
 conditions, including:
 (1)  rickets;
 (2)  Ehlers-Danlos Syndrome;
 (3)  osteogenesis imperfecta;
 (4)  vitamin D deficiency; and
 (5)  other similar metabolic bone diseases or
 connective tissue disorders.
 (c)  If, during an abuse or neglect investigation or an
 assessment provided under Subsection (b), the department or a
 physician in the network determines that a child requires a
 specialty consultation with a physician, the department or the
 physician shall refer the child's case to the system for the
 consultation, if the system has available capacity to take the
 child's case.
 (d)  In providing assessments to the department as provided
 by Subsection (b), the network and the system must use a blind peer
 review process to resolve cases where physicians in the network or
 system disagree in the assessment of the causes of a child's
 injuries or in the presence of a condition listed under Subsection
 (b).
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an agreement entered into or renewed on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for the purpose
 of implementing this Act, this Act has no effect.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *