Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2880 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2880
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the criminal punishment for the threatened exhibition
 or use of a firearm in or on school property or on a school bus.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.125, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 37.125.  EXHIBITION, USE, OR THREAT OF EXHIBITION OR
 USE OF FIREARMS. (a) A person commits an offense if, in a manner
 intended to cause alarm or personal injury to another person or to
 damage school property, the person intentionally:
 (1)  exhibits or [,] uses[, or threatens to exhibit or
 use] a firearm:
 (A) [(1)]  in or on any property, including a
 parking lot, parking garage, or other parking area, that is owned by
 a private or public school; or
 (B) [(2)]  on a school bus being used to transport
 children to or from school-sponsored activities of a private or
 public school;
 (2)  threatens to exhibit or use a firearm in or on
 property described by Subdivision (1)(A) or on a bus described by
 Subdivision (1)(B) and was in possession of or had immediate access
 to the firearm; or
 (3)  threatens to exhibit or use a firearm in or on
 property described by Subdivision (1)(A) or on a bus described by
 Subdivision (1)(B).
 (b)  An offense under Subsection (a)(1) or (2) [this section]
 is a third degree felony.
 (c)  An offense under Subsection (a)(3) is a Class A
 misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *