Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2888 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Romero, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2888
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an inmate's completion of classes or programs before
 being released on parole.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 508.152(b-2) and (c), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (b-2)  At least once in every 12-month period, the department
 shall review each inmate's individual treatment plan to assess the
 inmate's institutional progress and revise or update the plan as
 necessary. The department shall make reasonable efforts to provide
 an inmate the opportunity to complete any classes or programs
 included in the inmate's individual treatment plan, other than
 classes or programs that are to be completed immediately before the
 inmate's release on parole, in a timely manner so that the inmate's
 release on parole is not delayed due to any uncompleted classes or
 programs.
 (c)  The board shall conduct an initial review of an eligible
 inmate not later than the 180th day after the date of the inmate's
 admission to the institutional division. The board shall identify
 any classes or programs that the board intends to require the inmate
 to complete before releasing the inmate on parole. The department
 shall provide the inmate with a list of those classes or programs.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *