Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2964 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2017

                    By: Meyer, Button (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2964
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to abandonment of shares of a mutual fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 72, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 72.1011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 72.1011.  SHARES OF MUTUAL FUND. The three-year period
 established by Section 72.101 with respect to the abandonment of
 shares in a mutual fund begins on the later of the date of:
 (1)  the last investment in the mutual fund made by or
 on behalf of the owner; or
 (2)  the last payment to the owner or reinvestment by or
 on behalf of the owner of a dividend from the mutual fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *