Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2994 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2994
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 17, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2994 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to workforce continuing education offered by public junior
 colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 130, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter L to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER L.  WORKFORCE CONTINUING EDUCATION
 Sec. 130.301.  DEFINITIONS.  In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Adult" means a person who:
 (A)  has completed the person's sophomore year of
 high school;
 (B)  is 17 years of age and has been awarded a high
 school diploma or its equivalent; or
 (C)  is 18 years of age or older, regardless of the
 person's previous educational experience.
 (2)  "Avocational course" means a course of study in a
 subject or activity that is usually engaged in by a person in
 addition to the person's regular work or profession for recreation
 or in relation to a hobby. The term includes a community interest
 course.
 (3)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (4)  "Workforce continuing education" means a program
 of instruction that:
 (A)  is designed primarily for adults; and
 (B)  is intended, on completion by a participant,
 to prepare the participant to qualify to apply for and accept an
 employment offer or a job upgrade within a specific occupational
 category or to bring the participant's knowledge or skills up to
 date on new developments in a particular occupation or profession.
 (5)  "Workforce continuing education course" means a
 course of instruction in workforce continuing education that is
 approved by the coordinating board. The term does not include an
 avocational course.
 Sec. 130.302.  FORMULA FUNDING FOR WORKFORCE CONTINUING
 EDUCATION COURSES.  Notwithstanding Section 130.003 or any other
 law, contact hours attributable to the enrollment of a student in a
 workforce continuing education course offered by a public junior
 college shall be included in the contact hours used to determine the
 college's proportionate share of state money appropriated and
 distributed to public junior colleges under Sections 130.003 and
 130.0031, regardless of whether the college waives all or part of
 the tuition or fees for the course under Section 130.304.
 Sec. 130.303.  WORKFORCE CONTINUING EDUCATION FOR HIGH
 SCHOOL STUDENTS.  (a)  A public junior college may offer, or may
 enter into an agreement with a school district, organization, or
 other person that operates a high school to offer, workforce
 continuing education courses other than learning framework
 courses, basic employability courses, and basic learning skills
 courses to a person who:
 (1)  is enrolled in high school on the completion of the
 person's sophomore year;
 (2)  is enrolled in a school that is not formally
 organized as a high school and is at least 16 years of age; or
 (3)  is attending high school while incarcerated, is at
 least 16 years of age, and is not eligible for release from
 incarceration before the person's 18th birthday.
 (b)  This section does not prohibit a public junior college
 from offering community interest continuing education courses
 using local funds.
 Sec. 130.304.  WAIVER OF TUITION AND FEES FOR WORKFORCE
 CONTINUING EDUCATION COURSES. A public junior college may waive
 all or part of the tuition or fees charged to a student for a
 workforce continuing education course.
 Sec. 130.305.  RULES.  The coordinating board shall adopt
 any rules the coordinating board considers necessary for the
 administration of this subchapter. In adopting those rules, the
 coordinating board shall use the negotiated rulemaking procedures
 under Chapter 2008, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *