Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2999 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bonnen of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2999
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 12, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2999 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property
 owned by certain medical centers in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.23(j-1), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (j-1)  Medical Center Development in Populous Counties. In a
 county with a population of 3.3 million or more [described by
 Section 201.1055(1), Transportation Code], all real and personal
 property owned by a nonprofit corporation, as that term is defined
 by Section 22.001, Business Organizations Code, organized
 exclusively for benevolent, charitable, and educational purposes
 [in the Texas Non-Profit Corporation Act (Article 1396-1.01 et
 seq., Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes)], and held for use in the
 development or operation of a medical center area or areas in which
 the nonprofit corporation has donated land for a state medical,
 dental, or nursing school, [and] for other hospital, medical,
 educational, research, or nonprofit uses and uses reasonably
 related to those uses [thereto], for auxiliary uses to support
 those benevolent, charitable, and educational functions, including
 the invention, development, and dissemination of materials, tools,
 technologies, processes, and similar means for translating and
 applying medical and scientific research for practical
 applications to advance public health, or for governmental or
 public purposes, including the relief of traffic congestion, [and
 not leased or otherwise used with a view to profit,] is exempt from
 all ad valorem taxation [as though the property were, during that
 time, owned and held by the state for health and educational
 purposes]. In connection with the application or enforcement of a
 deed restriction or a covenant related to the property, a use or
 purpose described in this subsection shall also be considered to be
 a hospital, medical, or educational use, or a use that is reasonably
 related to a hospital, medical, or educational use.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.23(j-1), Tax Code, as amended by this
 Act, does not exempt from ad valorem taxation any interest in real
 or personal property, including a leasehold or other possessory
 interest, of a for-profit lessee of property for which a nonprofit
 corporation is entitled to an exemption from ad valorem taxation
 under that subsection.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
 for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *