Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3019 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Burkett, Button (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3019
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution for the offense of injury to a child,
 elderly individual, or disabled individual.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 22.04(a-1) and (i), Penal Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A person commits an offense if the person is an owner,
 operator, or employee of a group home, nursing facility, assisted
 living facility, boarding home facility, intermediate care
 facility for persons with an intellectual or developmental
 disability [mental retardation], or other institutional care
 facility and the person intentionally, knowingly, recklessly, or
 with criminal negligence by omission causes to a child, elderly
 individual, or disabled individual who is a resident of that group
 home or facility:
 (1)  serious bodily injury;
 (2)  serious mental deficiency, impairment, or injury;
 or
 (3)  bodily injury.
 (i)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under
 Subsection (b)(2) that before the offense the actor:
 (1)  notified in person the child, elderly individual,
 or disabled individual that the actor [he] would no longer provide
 any of the care described by Subsection (d),[;] and
 [(2)]  notified in writing the parents or a person,
 other than the actor, [himself] acting in loco parentis to the
 child, elderly individual, or disabled individual that the actor
 [he] would no longer provide any of the care described by Subsection
 (d); or
 (2) [(3)]  notified in writing the Department of Family
 and Protective [and Regulatory] Services that the actor [he] would
 no longer provide any of the care described by [set forth in]
 Subsection (d).
 SECTION 2.  Section 22.04(c)(3), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (3)  "Disabled individual" means a person:
 (A)  with one or more of the following:
 (i)  autism spectrum disorder, as defined by
 Section 1355.001, Insurance Code;
 (ii)  developmental disability, as defined
 by Section 112.042, Human Resources Code;
 (iii)  intellectual disability, as defined
 by Section 591.003, Health and Safety Code;
 (iv)  severe emotional disturbance, as
 defined by Section 261.001, Family Code; [or]
 (v)  traumatic brain injury, as defined by
 Section 92.001, Health and Safety Code; or
 (vi)  mental illness, as defined by Section
 571.003, Health and Safety Code; or
 (B)  who otherwise by reason of age or physical or
 mental disease, defect, or injury is substantially unable to
 protect the person's self from harm or to provide food, shelter, or
 medical care for the person's self.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *