Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3046 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Dale (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3046
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 1; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to combined municipal sales tax ballot propositions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 321.409(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any provisions of this code or other
 state law, a municipality may by a combined ballot proposition
 lower or repeal any [dedicated or special purpose] municipal sales
 tax, including the additional sales tax for property tax relief,
 and by the same proposition raise or adopt any other [dedicated or
 special purpose] municipal sales tax, including the additional
 sales tax for property tax relief.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *