H.B. No. 3083 AN ACT relating to repayment of certain mental health professional education loans. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 61.601, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 61.601. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "mental health professional" means: (1) a licensed physician who is: (A) a graduate of an accredited psychiatric residency training program; or (B) certified in psychiatry by: (i) the American Board of Psychiatry and Neurology; or (ii) the American Osteopathic Board of Neurology and Psychiatry; (2) a psychologist, as defined by Section 501.002, Occupations Code; (3) a licensed professional counselor, as defined by Section 503.002, Occupations Code; (4) an advanced practice registered nurse, as defined by Section 301.152, Occupations Code, who holds a nationally recognized board certification in psychiatric or mental health nursing; [and] (5) a licensed clinical social worker, as defined by Section 505.002, Occupations Code; and (6) a chemical dependency counselor, as defined by Section 504.001, Occupations Code. SECTION 2. Section 61.604, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: (d) Notwithstanding Subsection (c), if in a state fiscal year not all funds available for purposes of the program are used, the board may allocate any unused funds to award repayment assistance grants to mental health professionals in any of the professions listed in Section 61.601. SECTION 3. Section 61.607(b), Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The total amount of repayment assistance received by a mental health professional under this subchapter may not exceed: (1) $160,000, for assistance from the state received by a licensed physician; (2) $80,000, for assistance from the state received by: (A) a psychologist; (B) a licensed clinical social worker, if the social worker has received a doctoral degree related to social work; or (C) a licensed professional counselor, if the counselor has received a doctoral degree related to counseling; (3) $60,000, for assistance from the state received by an advanced practice registered nurse; [and] (4) $40,000, for assistance from the state received by a licensed clinical social worker or a licensed professional counselor who is not described by Subdivision (2); and (5) $10,000, for assistance from the state received by a licensed chemical dependency counselor, if the chemical dependency counselor has received an associate degree related to chemical dependency counseling or behavioral science. SECTION 4. The heading to Section 61.608, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 61.608. RULES; ADMINISTRATION. SECTION 5. Section 61.608, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: (c) The board shall adopt rules establishing a process for allocating any unused funds under the program in accordance with Section 61.604(d). (d) The board shall administer the program under this subchapter in a manner that maximizes any matching funds available through the state loan repayment program under the National Health Service Corps program of the United States Department of Health and Human Services Health Resources and Services Administration. SECTION 6. Section 61.609, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 61.609. SOLICITATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF FUNDS. (a) The board may solicit and accept gifts and grants from any public or private source for the purposes of this subchapter. (b) The board annually shall seek the maximum amount of funds available through the state loan repayment program under the National Health Service Corps program of the United States Department of Health and Human Services Health Resources and Services Administration. SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3083 was passed by the House on May 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 16, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 3083 on May 26, 2017, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3083 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 18, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3083 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3083 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 6. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor