Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3181 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 3181
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2, 1 present not voting;
 May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain counties to impose a hotel
 occupancy tax and to the purposes for which that tax revenue may be
 used.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (x) to read as follows:
 (x)  The commissioners court of a county that has a
 population of less than 100,000 and that borders Lake Ray Roberts
 may impose a tax as provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.003, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (u) to read as follows:
 (u)  The tax rate in a county authorized to impose the tax
 under Section 352.002(x) may not exceed two percent of the price
 paid for a room in a hotel.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 352.113 to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.113.  USE OF REVENUE: CERTAIN COUNTIES BORDERING
 LAKE RAY ROBERTS. In addition to the purposes authorized by this
 chapter, the revenue from a tax imposed under this chapter by a
 county authorized to impose the tax under Section 352.002(x) may be
 used for any purpose described by Section 352.101(a).
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *