Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3257 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2017

                    By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3257
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation and inspection of boilers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 755.001(17), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (17)  "Portable [power] boiler" means a boiler
 primarily intended for use at a temporary location.
 SECTION 2.  Section 755.022(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  boilers owned or operated by the federal
 government;
 (2)  pressure vessels or process steam generators,
 other than steam collection or liberation drums of process steam
 generators;
 (3)  manually fired miniature boilers that:
 (A)  are constructed or maintained for
 locomotives, boats, tractors, or stationary engines only as a hobby
 for exhibition, recreation, education, or historical purposes and
 not for commercial use;
 (B)  have an inside diameter of 12 inches or less
 or a grate area of two square feet or less; and
 (C)  are equipped with a safety valve of adequate
 size, a water level indicator, and a pressure gauge;
 (4)  boilers that are designed for operation only at
 atmospheric pressure and that are equipped with two independent
 means to prevent the buildup of pressure; [or]
 (5)  steam cookers; or
 (6)  espresso machines.
 SECTION 3.  Section 755.025(e), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The commission by rule shall establish the subsequent
 intervals and manner of inspection for a [A] portable [power]
 boiler [must be inspected externally each time the boiler is moved
 to a new location and must receive an internal inspection at least
 annually].
 SECTION 4.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
 adopt the rules necessary to implement the changes in law made by
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *