Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3272 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wray (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 3272
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the suspension, revocation, or cancellation of a
 driver's license or personal identification certificate and to
 certain conduct constituting contempt of court that may result in
 the suspension or denial of a driver's license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Article 45.050, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Art. 45.050.  FAILURE TO PAY FINE; FAILURE TO APPEAR;
 CONTEMPT: JUVENILES.
 SECTION 2.  Article 45.050(b), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A justice or municipal court may not order the
 confinement of a child for:
 (1)  the failure to pay all or any part of a fine or
 costs imposed for the conviction of an offense punishable by fine
 only; [or]
 (2)  the failure to appear for an offense committed by
 the child; or
 (3)  contempt of another order of a justice or
 municipal court.
 SECTION 3.  Section 521.292(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall suspend the person's license if the
 department determines that the person:
 (1)  has operated a motor vehicle on a highway while the
 person's license was suspended, canceled, disqualified, or
 revoked, or without a license after an application for a license was
 denied;
 (2)  is a habitually reckless or negligent operator of
 a motor vehicle;
 (3)  is a habitual violator of the traffic laws;
 (4)  has permitted the unlawful or fraudulent use of
 the person's license;
 (5)  has committed an offense in another state or
 Canadian province that, if committed in this state, would be
 grounds for suspension;
 (6)  has been convicted of two or more separate
 offenses of a violation of a restriction imposed on the use of the
 license;
 (7)  has been responsible as a driver for any accident
 resulting in serious personal injury or serious property damage;
 (8)  is under 18 years of age [the holder of a
 provisional license issued under Section 521.123] and has been
 convicted of two or more moving violations committed within a
 12-month period; or
 (9)  has committed an offense under Section 545.421.
 SECTION 4.  Section 521.294, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.294.  DEPARTMENT'S DETERMINATION FOR LICENSE
 REVOCATION. The department shall revoke the person's license if
 the department determines that the person:
 (1)  is incapable of safely operating a motor vehicle;
 (2)  has not complied with the terms of a citation
 issued by a jurisdiction that is a party to the Nonresident Violator
 Compact of 1977 for a traffic violation to which that compact
 applies;
 (3)  has failed to provide medical records or has
 failed to undergo medical or other examinations as required by a
 panel of the medical advisory board;
 (4)  has failed to pass an examination required by the
 director under this chapter; or
 (5)  [has been reported by a court under Section
 521.3452 for failure to appear unless the court files an additional
 report on final disposition of the case;
 [(6)     has been reported within the preceding two years
 by a justice or municipal court for failure to appear or for a
 default in payment of a fine for a misdemeanor punishable only by
 fine, other than a failure reported under Section 521.3452,
 committed by a person who is at least 14 years of age but younger
 than 17 years of age when the offense was committed, unless the
 court files an additional report on final disposition of the case;
 or
 [(7)]  has committed an offense in another state or
 Canadian province that, if committed in this state, would be
 grounds for revocation.
 SECTION 5.  Section 521.300, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A hearing under this subchapter may be conducted by
 telephone or video conference call if the presiding officer
 provides notice to the affected parties.
 SECTION 6.  Section 521.314, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.314.  CANCELLATION AUTHORITY. The department may
 cancel a license or certificate if it determines that the holder:
 (1)  is [was] not entitled to the license or
 certificate; [or]
 (2)  failed to give required information in the
 application for the license or certificate; or
 (3)  paid the required fee for the license or
 certificate by check or credit card that was returned to the
 department or not honored by the funding institution or credit card
 company due to insufficient funds, a closed account, or any other
 reason.
 SECTION 7.  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 521.292, 521.294, and 521.314, Transportation Code, apply only to a
 determination to suspend, revoke, or cancel a driver's license or
 personal identification certificate made by the Department of
 Public Safety on or after the effective date of this Act.  A
 determination to suspend, revoke, or cancel a driver's license or
 personal identification certificate made before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the determination
 was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *