Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3292 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3292


 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of medical assistance for certain
 individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0256 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0256.  CONTINUATION OF MEDICAL ASSISTANCE FOR
 CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS. (a) A recipient described by Section
 32.025(a) who experiences a temporary increase in income of a
 duration of one month or less that would result in the recipient
 being ineligible for medical assistance continues to be eligible
 for that assistance if the individual:
 (1)  either:
 (A)  receives services through a program for
 individuals with an intellectual or developmental disability
 authorized under Section 1915(c), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C.
 Section 1396n(c)); or
 (B)  resides in an ICF-IID facility; and
 (2)  continues to meet the functional and diagnostic
 criteria for the receipt of services under a program described by
 Subdivision (1)(A) or for residency in an ICF-IID facility.
 (b)  To continue to be eligible for medical assistance, a
 recipient described by Subsection (a) must submit an application
 for medical assistance in accordance with Section 32.025(b) not
 later than the 90th day after the date on which the recipient is
 determined ineligible.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  The Health and Human Services Commission is
 required to implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates
 money specifically for that purpose.  If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the commission
 may, but is not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3292 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3292 on May 26, 2017, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3292 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3292 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3292 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor