Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3295 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3295


 AN ACT
 relating to the delivery of certain Medicaid services to certain
 persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 534.111, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 534.111.  CONCLUSION OF PILOT PROGRAMS;
 EXPIRATION.  On September 1, 2019 [2018]:
 (1)  each pilot program established under this
 subchapter that is still in operation must conclude; and
 (2)  this subchapter expires.
 SECTION 2.  Section 534.201(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  On September 1, 2020 [2018], the commission shall
 transition the provision of Medicaid benefits to individuals to
 whom this section applies to the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care
 program delivery model or the most appropriate integrated capitated
 managed care program delivery model, as determined by the
 commission based on cost-effectiveness and the experience of the
 STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care program in providing basic
 attendant and habilitation services and of the pilot programs
 established under Subchapter C, subject to Subsection (c)(1).
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Using existing resources, the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall:
 (1)  identify and evaluate barriers preventing
 Medicaid recipients enrolled in the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed
 care program or a home and community-based services waiver program
 from choosing the consumer directed services option and develop
 recommendations for increasing the percentage of Medicaid
 recipients enrolled in those programs who choose the consumer
 directed services option; and
 (2)  study the feasibility of establishing a community
 attendant registry to assist Medicaid recipients enrolled in the
 community attendant services program in locating providers.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall submit a report containing the
 commission's findings and recommendations under Subsection (a) of
 this section to the governor, the legislature, and the Legislative
 Budget Board.  The report required by this subsection may be
 combined with any other report required by this Act or other law.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall conduct a study of the provision of dental services to adults
 with disabilities under the Medicaid program, including:
 (1)  the types of dental services provided, including
 preventive dental care, emergency dental services, and
 periodontal, restorative, and prosthodontic services;
 (2)  limits or caps on the types and costs of dental
 services provided;
 (3)  unique considerations in providing dental care to
 adults with disabilities, including additional services necessary
 for adults with particular disabilities; and
 (4)  the availability and accessibility of dentists who
 provide dental care to adults with disabilities, including the
 availability of dentists who provide additional services necessary
 for adults with particular disabilities.
 (b)  In conducting the study under Subsection (a) of this
 section, the Health and Human Services Commission shall:
 (1)  identify the number of adults with disabilities
 whose Medicaid benefits include limited or no dental services and
 who, as a result, have sought medically necessary dental services
 during an emergency room visit;
 (2)  if feasible, estimate the number of adults with
 disabilities who are receiving services under the Medicaid program
 and who have access to alternative sources of dental care,
 including pro bono dental services, faith-based dental services
 providers, and other public health care providers; and
 (3)  collect data on the receipt of dental services
 during emergency room visits by adults with disabilities who are
 receiving services under the Medicaid program, including the
 reasons for seeking dental services during an emergency room visit
 and the costs of providing the dental services during an emergency
 room visit, as compared to the cost of providing the dental services
 in the community.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall submit a report containing the results of
 the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section and the
 commission's recommendations for improving access to dental
 services in the community for and reducing the provision of dental
 services during emergency room visits to adults with disabilities
 receiving services under the Medicaid program to the governor, the
 legislature, and the Legislative Budget Board.  The report required
 by this subsection may be combined with any other report required by
 this Act or other law.
 SECTION 5.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3295 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3295 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3295 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor