Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3423 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Lambert (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3423
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recording by a county clerk of certain documents
 relating to the sale or lease of public school land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.065, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.065.  NOTICE AND RECORD OF SALE. (a) The
 commissioner shall send a written notice of the sale of a tract of
 public school land to [notify] the county clerk of the proper county
 that includes [of the sale of each tract of land,] the name and
 address of the purchaser[,] and the price of the land.
 (b)   After receiving a notice of the [being informed of any]
 sale of public school land, the county clerk shall record the notice
 at no charge in the official public records of the county [enter in
 his books opposite the description of the land sold, the name of the
 purchaser and the date of the sale].
 (c)  The notice of sale is a [and the book containing the
 entry are] public record [records].
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.066(c), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  One copy of the land award shall be retained in the land
 office, one [and the other] copy shall be sent to the purchaser, and
 one copy shall be sent to the county clerk of the proper county to be
 recorded at no charge in the official public records of the county.
 SECTION 3.  Section 51.176(c), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The county clerk shall mark the exact date and hour of
 filing on the original and a duplicate copy of the vacancy
 application and shall return a marked copy to the person filing the
 application. The original shall be recorded in the official public
 records of the county [a book kept for that purpose separate from
 the deed or real property records]. The failure to record a vacancy
 application as provided by this subsection does not affect the
 validity of the application filing.
 SECTION 4.  Section 12.0011, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  This section does not apply to a notice of sale under
 Section 51.065, Natural Resources Code, or a land award under
 Section 51.066, Natural Resources Code.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 51.065 and 51.066, Natural Resources
 Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to a sale of property that
 occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. For the purposes
 of this section, a sale of property occurs before the effective date
 of this Act if the contract binding the purchaser to purchase the
 property is entered into before that date. A sale of property that
 occurs before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before that date, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *