Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3442 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Cook (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3442
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0, 2 present not voting; May 18, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Fairfield Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1015.052, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1015.052.  NOTICE OF ELECTION. Notice [At least 35 days
 before the date of an election of directors, notice] of an [the]
 election of directors shall be published in accordance with Chapter
 4, Election Code [one time in a newspaper with general circulation
 in the district].
 SECTION 2.  Section 1015.252, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection
 (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  The tax rate for all purposes may not exceed 12 cents on
 each $100 valuation of all taxable property in the district, unless
 the tax rate is increased as provided by Section 1015.254.
 (b-1)  If an increase in the tax rate is approved at an
 election under Section 1015.254, the tax rate for all purposes may
 not exceed the maximum tax rate approved by the voters at the
 election.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1015, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 1015.254 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1015.254.  ELECTION TO INCREASE MAXIMUM TAX RATE. (a)
 The board may order an election to increase the maximum tax rate of
 the district to a rate not to exceed 25 cents on each $100 valuation
 of the taxable property in the district.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (d), the board shall order an
 election to increase the maximum tax rate of the district on
 presentation of a petition that:
 (1)  requests the election;
 (2)  states the maximum tax rate to be voted on at the
 election; and
 (3)  is signed by at least 100 registered voters of the
 district, as determined by the most recent official list of
 registered voters.
 (c)  The board by order shall set a time and place to hold a
 hearing on the petition.  The board shall set a date for the hearing
 that is not earlier than the 11th day after the date the board
 issues the order.
 (d)  If, after the hearing, the board determines that the
 petition is in proper form and that an increase of the maximum tax
 rate would benefit the district, the board shall order an election
 to authorize the increase of the maximum tax rate to the tax rate
 stated in the petition.
 (e)  The election order must state:
 (1)  the nature of the election, including the
 proposition that is to appear on the ballot;
 (2)  the maximum tax rate to be voted on at the
 election;
 (3)  the date of the election;
 (4)  the hours during which the polls will be open; and
 (5)  the location of the polling places.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *