Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3484 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3484
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2, 2 present not voting; May 18, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3484 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.1079 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.1079.  ALLOCATION OF REVENUE FOR SPORTS FACILITIES
 AND FIELDS BY CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) This section applies
 only to a municipality that has a population of at least 6,000 and
 that is the county seat of a county that:
 (1)  borders the State of Louisiana;
 (2)  is bisected by a United States highway; and
 (3)  has a population of 75,000 or less.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter and
 subject to Subsection (c), a municipality to which this section
 applies may use all or any portion of the revenue derived from the
 municipal hotel occupancy tax to construct, improve, maintain, and
 operate sports facilities and fields for the purpose of promoting
 tourism and the convention and hotel industry.
 (c)  A municipality to which this section applies may use
 revenue derived from the municipal hotel occupancy tax to:
 (1)  maintain or operate sports facilities and fields
 only if the conditions specified by Sections 351.101(a)(7)(A) and
 (C) are met; and
 (2)  improve a sports facility or field only if the
 requirements of Sections 351.101(a)(7)(A) and (C) are met and the
 municipality complies with Section 351.1076.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *