Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3496 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Shine (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3496
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to voting procedures for policyholders of farm mutual
 insurance companies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 911.065, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A farm mutual insurance company may provide in its
 constitution or bylaws that a policyholder may vote electronically
 or by mail without making a personal appearance at a policyholders'
 meeting.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *