Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3504 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Miller (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3504
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain county assistance districts to
 annex public rights-of-way and county-owned property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 387.0031, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 387.0031.  INCLUSION OF ROADS OR COUNTY PROPERTY IN
 CERTAIN DISTRICTS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 387.0031, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection
 (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  The governing body of a district by order may include in
 the district a portion of a road or public right-of-way, including
 associated drainage areas, or county-owned property that is being
 used for a public purpose if:
 (1)  the road, public right-of-way, or county-owned
 property [that] is located in a municipality located in the county
 that created the district; and
 (2)  [if] the municipality consents to the inclusion.
 (b-1)  An election is not required to approve an order
 described by Subsection (b) [this subsection].
 (c)  The district may use money available to the district to
 perform any function of the district under this chapter
 [maintenance or improvement] on a road or public right-of-way,
 including [and the] associated drainage areas, or any property
 included in the district in accordance with this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *