Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3563 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2017

                    By: Koop (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 3563
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to parental notification regarding public school teacher
 qualifications.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.057(e), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  This section does not apply if a school is required in
 accordance with Section 1006 [1111(h)(6)(B)(ii)], Every Student
 Succeeds Act (20 U.S.C. Section 6312(e)(1)(B)(ii)) [No Child Left
 Behind Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Section 6311), and its subsequent
 amendments], to provide notice to a parent or guardian regarding a
 teacher who does not meet certification requirements at the grade
 level and subject area in which the teacher is assigned [is not
 highly qualified], provided the school provides notice as required
 by that Act.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *