Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3567 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Bonnen of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3567
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for persons
 who served in the 11th Armored Cavalry Regiment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, as
 amended by Chapters 708 (H.B. 1128) and 716 (H.B. 1273), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended
 to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Other than license plates issued under Subsection
 (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on
 request:
 (1)  the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or
 (2)  one emblem from another license plate to which the
 person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.311, 504.312,
 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315, 504.316, 504.318, 504.319,
 [or] 504.320, or 504.323.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.323 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.323.  11TH ARMORED CAVALRY REGIMENT. The
 department shall issue specialty license plates for persons who
 have served in the 11th Armored Cavalry Regiment of the United
 States Army. The license plates must include the 11th Armored
 Cavalry Regiment emblem and must include the words "11th Armored
 Cavalry Regiment" at the bottom of each plate.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *